top of page

Math by Vedic way by Arsh Dubey 25Feb2020

Updated: Mar 22, 2020


Curiosity to attend my second class of e-Yogi Gurukul was at its peak, like last time we started off with chanting our starting mantra. Initially, we revised whatever we did in our first class.

Nalanda

Afterwards we learned about Nalanda (internationally recognized university). It was a proud feeling that people from Korea, Japan, China, Indonesia, Turkey, Tibet and Central Asia came to study in in our country (INDIA) and fact about Nalanda that it was running with 2,000 teachers and 10,000 students during its peak time. Subjects thought in the university were Vedas, Sankhya, Sanskrit grammar, Ayurveda, Vedanta, Buddhist, philosophies, etc. University had a huge library of the books on the subjects thought in the university. A Turkish invader “Bakhtiyar Khilji” got jealous with knowledge of the alumni’s & students that’s the reason he attacked the university. His warriors burnt the Nalanda’s university library and most of books was a single copy of its time. He burnt all the books so no knowledge would be left to be taught further in 1993 AD.

Adi Shankarcharya

I also learned a few mantras by Adi Shankarcharya he was reputed to have founded four mathas (Monasteries).

Vedic Math

Most interesting part of class was learning about Vedic Maths. In this I learned to multiple numbers by using second sukta;

“Nikhilam Navatashcaramam Dashatta”

After class at home I tried a couple of examples to seek perfection more. I am listing down one of my examples below:

Example 1: - Assume we have to multiple 98 X 96=?

Step 1: Find how much both numbers are less than 100.

100 - 98 = 02 and

100 - 96 = 04

Step 2: multiply right-hand side numbers together.

02 X 04 = 08

Step 3: Take away the diagonal numbers like shown below.

98 – 4 = 94

96 – 2 = 94

Step 4: Multiple 100 with number we got in step 3 and sum with number we got in step 2 as below and answer is 9400 + 08 = 9408.

Let’s take another example;

Example 2: - Assume we have to multiple 87 X 83 =?

Step 1: Find how much both numbers are less than 100.

100 - 87 = 13 and

100 - 83 = 17

Step 2: multiply right-hand side numbers together.

13 X 17 = 221

Step 3: Take away the diagonal numbers like shown below.

87 – 17 = 70

83 – 13 = 70

Step 4: Multiple 100 with number we got in step 3 and sum with number we got in step 2 as below and answer is 7000 + 221 = 7221.

Let’s take another example for three-digit numbers;

Example 3 - Assume we have to multiple 106 X 103 =?

Step 1: Find how much both numbers are greater than 100.

106 - 100 = 6 and

103 - 100 = 3

Step 2: multiply right-hand side numbers together.

6 X 3 = 18

Step 3: Add (as both numbers are greater than 100) the diagonal numbers like shown below.

106 + 3 = 109

103 + 6 = 109

Step 4: Multiple 100 with number we got in step 3 and sum with number we got in step 2 as below and answer is

10900 + 18 = 10918

I hope you enjoyed my blog. Stay tuned to my future blogs.

18 views0 comments

Recent Posts

See All